Collection search - Alcester
-
Record information – Brief Alcester
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:SourisDate(s):Established Closing 1884-04-01 0907-01-31 Province:ManitobaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15916 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Sec. 2, Twp. 5, R. 19, W - 1884-04-01Source:PSFDS03-(7436)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy James Johnston 1884-04-01 1887-03-15 Resignation John Metcalf 1888-01-01 1891-10-08 Resignation Mrs. Agnes Vosper 1892-06-01 1893-08-15 Resignation William Shipley 1894-02-01 1894-10-22 Resignation Abraham Monck 1896-02-01 1907-01-31 Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.