Benson, Edgar J., 1923-2011 : Edgar Benson was born in 1923 at Cobourg, Ontario, where he attended public and secondary schools. During the Second World War he served with the Royal Canadian Artillery from 1941 to 1946. Upon retuning to Canada, he enrolled at Queen's University, Kingston graduating with a Bachelor of Commerce degree in 1949. In 1952, he obtained his designation as a chartered accountant from the Institute of Chartered Accountants of Ontario. He then became a partner in the chartered account firm of England, Leonard, Macpherson and Company in Kingston where he remained a partner until 1964. In 1973, he was granted an L.L.D. by the Royal Military College.
Mr. Benson was first elected to Parliament as the member for the riding of Kingston and the Islands June 18, 1962. He was re-elected in the general elections of 1963, 1965 and 1968. He did not seek re-election in 1972. He was appointed Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of Finance when the Liberal party formed the government following the 1963 general election. He was appointed Minister of National Revenue June 29, 1964. He was re-appointed to this portfolio following the 1965 general election. On June 10, 1965, he was also appointed Vice-Chairman of the Treasury Board, and on October 3, 1966, he became President of the Treasury Board. In January 1968, Mr. Benson relinquished the post of Minister of National Revenue, retaining the portfolio of President of the Treasury Board, as well as assuming responsibility as the Minister in charge of Housing. His appointment as Minister of Finance came April 20, 1968, when he also retained the portfolio of President of the Treasury Board, but relinquished the responsibility as Minister responsible for Housing. He was again appointed Minister of Finance following the 1968 general election and served in that capacity until 1972. He also served as Minister of National Defence, 28 January to 30 October 1972. He resigned from the Cabinet and the House of Commons on August 31, 1972, and was appointed a member and President of the Canadian Transport Commission. He retired in August 1982 and was appointed High Commissioner to Ireland in September in 1982. Mr. Benson was married to the former Marie Van Laer of Nijmegen, Holland. They have three sons, Robert, Paul, and Peter, and a daughter Nancy.