Collection search - Port Elgin
-
Record information – Brief Port Elgin
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:BruceEstablished:1854-09-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15605 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Building rented by Department of Public WorksSaugeen - 1854-09-01Semi StaffStaff Grade 3Source:PSFDS03-(6372)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Alex H.R. Kennedy 1854-09-01 1855-03-14 Resignation John Jacob Lehnen 1855-07-01 1867-11-28 Resignation Archibald Roy 1868-01-01 1870-08 Death Mrs. Mary J. Roy 1870-10-01 1889-04-23 Resignation Henry N. Roy 1889-07-01 1916-05-08 Death Miss G. Gray 1916-05-31 1936-02-26 Resignation James Edgar Rushton O.A.S. 1936-07-15 1949-01-19 Death William Scarr O.A.S. * 1949-01-22 Acting William Scarr O.A.S. * 1950-01-22 1970-05-01 Retirement Harry C. Allin * 1970-05-01 Stan K. Hay 1983-09-02 Temporary Dan Foster 1984-11-05 Gary Hamer 1986-04-01 Temporary David Wilson 1986-09-10 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.