Collection search - Kippen
-
Record information – Brief Kippen
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:HuronEstablished:1855-11-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15584 -
Record information – Details Additional information:RevenueRevenue Grp. 3Revenue Grp. 4 - 1977-06-01StoreTuckersmith Twp - 1855-11-01Source:PSFDS03-(6496)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Robert Annan 1855-11-01 1856-05 Resignation Charles Lobb 1856-11-01 1857-04-01 Resignation Robert Bell 1857-06-04 1864-11-14 Resignation Robert Mellis 1865-01-01 1904-09-06 Resignation John Balfour 1904-10-01 1912-02-16 Non-residence of PM Jacob Deteriler 1912-03-01 1920-01-17 Resignation Robert Brownlee 1920-03-31 1921-09-10 Resignation William Edgar Butt 1887-09 1921-11-17 1943-09-18 Resignation Harvey Henry Damm 1892-03-17 1943-11-03 Acting Harvey Henry Damm 1892-03-17 1944-02-03 1950-07-06 Resignation Norman William Dickert 1901-03-05 1950-07-21 Acting Norman William Dickert 1901-03-05 1950-11-10 1968-03-05 Retirement Kenneth Ray McLellan * 1968-03-30 Mrs. Merle I. McLellan 1982-10-19 Mrs. Merle I. McLellan 1983-03-21 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.