Collection search - Kleinburg
-
Record information – Brief Kleinburg
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:York NorthEstablished:1852-05-06Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15485 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(6933)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Milton E. Spears H.S. Howland 1852-05-06 1870-03-28 Resignation Thomas White 1870-06-01 1883-03-14 Resignation Thomas R. Allison 1883-07-01 1886-11-17 Resignation Robert Hollingshead 1887-01-01 1901-02-07 * J.F. East 1901-03-01 1913 Death William Mullin 1913-06-27 1915-01-12 Resignation Miss Elizabeth Mullin 1915-05-18 1932-07-11 * William Johnston Edan 1884-02-15 1932-11-03 1944-11-08 Resignation Mrs. Verna Lacey Lovatt * 1945-01-17 Acting Mrs. Verna Lacey Lovatt * 1945-04-04 1952-06-02 Resignation William Dyck * 1952-07-10 Acting William Dyck * 1952-10-23 1955-06-08 Resignation Samuel M. Keown * 1955-06-14 Acting Samuel M. Keown * 1955-11-07 1965-04-15 Resignation George Mackenzie Watson * 1965-07-01 George Mackenzie Watson * 1965-07-01 Acting *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.