Collection search - Huronville
-
Record information – Brief Huronville
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Moose MountainDate(s):Established Closing 1905-12-01 1964-10-31 Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15413 -
Record information – Details Additional information:DwellingNW 1/4 Sec.22, Twp.12, R.10, W2SE 1/4 Sec.28, Twp.13, R.10, W2 - 1958-04-07Sec.16, Twp.12, R.10, W2Sec.16, Twp.12, R.10, W2 - 1905-12-01Source:PSFDS03-(10092)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy William Treble 1905-12-01 1919-10-10 Resignation Thomas Treble 1920-02-02 1922-02-24 Resignation James Rollins 1875-05 1922-05-05 1948-11-08 Resignation George Walter Turnbull * 1949-03-01 Acting Harry Albert Baldock * 1949-05-01 Acting Harry Albert Baldock * 1949-09-26 1953-11-03 Resignation John Duckworth * 1953-12-07 Acting John Duckworth * 1954-04-05 1960-02-15 Resignation William Ivan Callfas * 1960-03-01 Acting William Ivan Callfas * 1960-04-06 1962-07-31 Resignation George Walter Turnbull * 1962-08-16 Acting George Walter Turnbull * 1962-10-02 1964-10-31 Office permanently closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.