Collection search - Ellisboro
-
Record information – Brief Ellisboro
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Qu'AppelleDate(s):Established Closing 1883-12-01 1969-03-31 Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15388 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Sec.17, Twp.18, R.9, W2 - 1883-12-01Source:PSFDS03-(9669)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy J. H. Ellis 1883-12-01 1914-11-12 Resignation Joseph J. Edward 1915-02-08 1921-10-27 Resignation L. S. Morrison OAS 1921-12-15 1927-04-26 Resignation James Wilfrid Tubman 1928-09-11 1936-06-01 Resignation William Charles Miller * 1936-07-04 1936-11-27 Resignation Samuel William Robert Devine * 1936-11-27 Acting Samuel William Robert Devine * 1937-01-08 1946-06-10 Resignation Mrs. Ruth Fordyce Wilson * 1946-06-16 Acting Mrs. Ruth Fordyce Wilson * 1946-09-25 1947-12-04 Resignation William Churchman OAS * 1948-01-01 1955-10-22 Resignation Ivan Glen Bloomfield * 1955-11-01 Acting Ivan Glen Bloomfield * 1956-02-24 1958-03-04 Resignation James Owen Clarke * 1958-04-01 Acting (Postmaster General) James Owen Clarke * 1959-02-03 1969-03-31 Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.