Collection search - St. Jean Baptiste de Rouville
-
Record information – Brief St. Jean Baptiste de Rouville
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Chambly - RouvilleEstablished:1849-08-06Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15312 -
Record information – Details Additional information:PO 2488-1Source:PSFDS03-(29574)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Louis D. Gareau (Shown as PM in 1853) 1855-03-29 Resignation Mrs Marie R.V. Gauthier 1978-10-11 Retraite, C.S.C. Alphonse Belanger 1855-07 1859-03-20 Death C.S. Gigon 1859-10-01 1866-04-02 Resignation Louis Riendeau 1866-07-01 1871-09-22 Death L.G.E. Goulet 1871-10-01 1888-11-12 Resignation Adrien Colette 1889-01-01 1901-06-03 Dismissal, political partisanship Pierre Lussier 1901-07-01 1904-05-28 Resignation Louis Lussier 1904-07-01 1907-01 Resignation J.O. Desautels 1907-02-01 1909-11-27 Resignation Miss Beatrice Desautels 1910-01-01 1926-10-26 Resignation Louis Honore Lemonde 1927-01-01 1932-10-17 Dismissal, O in C, political partisanship Joseph O. Bellimare (M.D.) 1932-10-25 1936-10-14 Dismissal, O in C, political partisanship Mrs Germaine B. Lemonde 1936-12-16 1955-04-04 Resignation Mrs Marie R.V. Lemonde * 1955-05-31 Melle B. Meunier 1978-10-12 1979-07-28 Intérimaire Mme Suzanne Cyr (Michaud) 1979-07-30 1983-02-21 Promotion Alice Doyon 1983-02-22 1983-06-22 Intérimaire Binette Dube 1983-06-23 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.