Collection search - Walton
-
Record information – Brief Walton
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:HuronEstablished:1862-01-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:15205 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Grey - 1862-01-01Lot 30, Con 10, Twp MorrisN 1/2, Lot 5 (Knox Survey)RevenueStore owned by PM - 152-08-23Source:PSFDS03-(6561)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy George Bigger 1862-01-01 1869-06-26 Resignation Robert Pattison 1869-10-01 1881 * William Neal 1881-04-01 1906-12-13 Resignation William G. Neal 1907-02-01 1928-09-06 Death John McLeod 1929-03-15 1930-03-03 Resignation William Clarence Bennett O.A.S. 1898-06-30 1930-10-01 1940 Granted Military Leave Mrs. Agnes Irene Bennett * 1940-07-30 Acting Mrs. Agnes Irene Bennett * 1941-03-25 Acting George Roy Bennett 1895-08-09 1941-03-25 Acting William Clarence Bennett (return from Forces) 1945-08-30 1952-08-23 Promotion as PM to RCAF Stn, Clinton, Ont. Thomas Barry Marshall O.A.S. * 1952-08-23 Acting Thomas Barry Marshall O.A.S. * 1952-11-13 1967-01-17 Promoted at Brigden, Ont. Stewart McDonald Humphries * 1967-01-18 Mrs. Marjory A. Humphries 1984-01-16 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.