Collection search - Mount Elgin
-
Record information – Brief Mount Elgin
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:OxfordEstablished:1851-07-06Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:14953 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Dereham - 1851-07-06Private Bldg.RevenueSource:PSFDS03-(6511)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy D.C. Wood 1851-07-06 Jessie Smith Woodward 1854-07-01 1862-03 Resignation E.V. Bodwell 1863-01-01 1863-02-20 Resignation F.G. Caulton 1863-04-01 1866-06-04 Resignation E.V. Boldwell 1866-07-01 1867-03-04 Resignation James Stevens 1867-07-01 1867-11-20 Resignation James B. Smart 1868-04-01 1870-09-29 Resignation Alex Collins 1870-10-01 1870-12-08 Resignation James Stevens 1871-06-01 1872-02-21 Resignation Isaac M. Elliott 1872-04-01 1873-12-11 Resignation James Stevens 1874-04-01 1875-09-13 Resignation George M. Collins 1875-10-01 1982-03-22 Resignation W.S. Hallman 1885-10-01 1886-01-18 Resignation Roger Miller 1886-03-01 1891-05-30 Resignation Miss Mary Miller 1891-08-01 1917-01-11 Resignation George R. Stone 1917-02-15 1934-06-04 Death Mrs. Anna Belle Stone 1875-01-25 1934-06-30 1946-08-02 Resignation Mrs. Euna Geraldine Ritchie * 1946-10-29 1978-09-13 George Ritchie 1978-09-14 Acting George T. Richie 1978-11-23 H.D. Johnson 1982-04-01 1985-09-05 Resignation D.C. Woodward PM in 1853 1854-06 Death *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.