Collection search - Sault Ship Canal sub
-
Record information – Brief Sault Ship Canal sub
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Algoma WestEstablished:1909-05-31Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:14362 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Canal Bldg. owned by Dept. of TransportChange to All Year Round Office - 1910-03-01Clerk, Gr. 2, Dept. of Transport - 1948-04-01payment as from 1st April 1947.Postmaster is paid remuneration on Sub Office scale ofSault Ste. Marie - 1909-05-31SubSummer Office - 1909-05-31Supt. of Canals Dept. of TransportSource:PSFDS03-(5395)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy St. Lawrence Seaway Authority J.W. Leb. Ross 1909-05-31 1936-04-22 Resignation John Stewart Macleod 1877-02-20 1936-04-22 Acting John Stewart Macleod 1877-02-20 1936-06-26 1943-02-12 Resignation Willard Hazelton Armstrong * 1943-02-15 Acting Leo Bernard McCourt O.A.S. 1893-03-22 1943-06-09 Resignation Robert Kendall Knight O.A.S. 1896-03-06 1948-04-01 1962-01-05 Resignation William Vivian Hall 1900-07-20 1962-03-03 1963-02-03 Death S. Erik Thureson O.A.S. * 1963-01-15 Acting Erik Thureson O.A.S. * 1963-04-19 1963-10-01 Resignation Lloyd George Shier * 1963-10-01 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.