Collection search - Styal
-
Record information – Brief Styal
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Jasper - Edson, Peace River, West EdmontonDate(s):Established Closing 1917-05-15 1964-05-22 Province:AlbertaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:13940 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Mail route - Styal-Railway StationSE Sec. 28, Twp. 53, R. 8, W5M - 1926-04-07, 1952-09-02Store owned by PM - 1952-09-02, 1952-11-19Source:PSFDS03-(14331)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy George Bolsover 1917-05-15 1918-12-02 Resignation Rufus Sylvester Hadley 1919-02-19 1934-09-27 Death Mrs. Margaret Ann Hadley 1879-02-18 1934-11-28 1935-08-30 Resignation Mrs. Louise Brake Wood Clark 1896-07-11 1935-09-30 Acting Mrs. Louise Brake Wood Clark 1896-07-11 1936-01-02 1940-09-30 Resignation Mrs. Margaret Ann Hadley 1879-02-18 1940-10-01 Acting Mrs. Margaret Ann Hadley 1879-02-18 1941-01-21 1952-08-09 Resignation Mrs. Mayme Agnes Elizabeth Collingridge * 1952-09-02 Acting Mrs. Edna Justine Hergott * 1952-11-19 Acting Mrs. Edna Justine Hergott * 1953-02-12 1961-07-24 Resignation Mrs. Hilda M. Demers * 1961-07-25 Acting Mrs. Hilda M. Demers * 1961-10-26 1962-09-13 Resignation Cyril Starr Hergott OAS 1962-09-14 Acting Oscar Nadon OAS * 1962-10-24 Acting Oscar Nadon OAS * 1963-07-17 1964-05-22 Resignation, closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.