Collection search - Worcester
-
Record information – Brief Worcester
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Moose MountainDate(s):Established Closing 1908-02-01 1967-12-01 Province:SaskatchewanReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:13924 -
Record information – Details Additional information:* re-transferredClosing date: Another date also given on card as 1966-12-01Sec.18, Twp.10, R.13, W2Sec.28, Twp.10, R.13, W2 - 1908-02-01StoreSource:PSFDS03-(11342)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy George Sproat 1908-02-01 1912-04-09 Change in Site F. Allan Shafford 1912-05-01 1918-05-21 Resignation H. S. Merrill 1918-10-08 1919-12-29 Resignation Claude R. Merrill OAS 1920-02-17 1924 * Henry Hailstone 1865-05-22 1924-06-26 1938-11-21 Resignation Jesse Lee McRae 1893-03-11 1938-12-31 1941 Granted Military Leave Murdoch Clendenin McRae * 1941-05-20 Acting Jesse Lee McRae * OAS 1893-03-11 1942-06-08 1947-05-17 Resignation Donald Henry Hibbert * 1947-06-01 Acting Donald Henry Hibbert * 1947-09-03 1949-09-23 Resignation Hilbert Alexander Spencer 1900-08-25 1949-10-01 Acting Hilbert Alexander Spencer 1900-08-25 1950-01-21 1956-09-18 Resignation George Andrew Renas * 1956-10-01 Acting George Andrew Renas * 1957-02-08 1965-06-10 Resignation Stanley Elroy Piller * 1965-07-25 Acting Stanley Elroy Piller * 1965-08-19 1966-10-24 Resignation *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.