Canada. Royal Canadian Air Force. Air Division Europe, no. 1 : 1 Air Division of the RCAF was formed in August 1952 with temporary headquarters in Paris, France, as the Canadian air force contribution to NATO, with four F-86 Sabre Fighter Wings under its command. Early in 1953 the Air Division Headquarters was moved to Metz, France, while the fighter Wings were stationed as follows: 2 Wing at Grostenquin, France, No. 3 at Zweibrucken, Germany, No. 4 at Baden-Soellingen, Germany and 1 Wing at Marville, France after moving there from North Luffenham in 1955. The role of 1 Air Division was to provide air support in wartime for strike, reconnaissance or attack operations as mandated by NATO command. By August 1957 each wing had replaced one of its Sabre squadrons with a CF100 all weather fighter squadron. By March 1964 all CF100s were replaced by the CF 104 Starfighter aircraft, which the RCAF judged better suited to its strike/reconnaissance role. On 1 April 1964 2 Wing was disbanded, with 430 Squadron, 421 Squadron and 190 KU moved to 3,4 and 1 Wings respectively. Canadian Forces Order 4.1, dated 1 April 1967, placed the following units under the commander of 1 Air Division: Headquarters at Lahr, 1 Wing at Lahr, 3 Wing at Zweibrucken, 4 Wing at Baden-Soellingen and the Air Weapons Unit Detachment at Decimomannu. At this time 1 Air Division was grouped as part of the 4th Allied Tactical Air Force. As a result of France pulling out of NATO all Canadian Wings were moved to German bases by 1967. In 1968 3 Wing was disbanded and its six CF104 squadrons were redistributed between 1 and 4 Wings. On 19 September 1969 the Canadian government announced a reorganization of the Canadian Forces in Europe that involved the major reduction in the establishment of the forces. 1 Air Division be redesignated as 1 Canadian Air Group, with its headquarters at CFB Lahr and its operational units based at CFB Baden-Soellingen. On 31 December 1971 the Canadian CF-104s of 421 and 441 Squadrons were retasked from a nuclear strike role to that of a conventional attack role. On 28 May 1988 1 Canadian Air Group reverted back to 1 Air Division and was committed to NATO's Central Army Group. The Air Division was integrated with Air Command and reported directly to Air Command Headquarters through Canadian Forces Europe on 1 January 1991. The command structure at the end of 1991 consisted of 1 Air Division Headquarters at CFB Lahr, 3 Wing Headquarters, and 4 Wing Headquarters. 1 Air Division sent the "Wild Cats", which consisted of 439 "Tiger" Squadron and 416 "Lynx" Squadron, to the Gulf War where they were committed to joint operations in All Weather Air Defence and Fighter Bomber Attack roles. 1 Air Division was disbanded on 31 July 1993. General inventory