Collection search - Les Cedres
-
Record information – Brief Les Cedres
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:VaudreuilEstablished:1789Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:1317 -
Record information – Details Source:PSFDS03-(26351)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Benjamin Joassin 1853 1864 Mort T. Marcoux 1864-04-01 1883-08-21 Resignation Esdras Bissonnette 1884-01-27 1890-06-10 Mort Arcade M. Bissonnette 1890-08-01 1896-10-01 J. O. Cuillerier 1896-11-01 1904-10-05 Resignation Joseph W. Cuillerier 1904-11-01 1905-11-12 J. Noe Bissonnette 1905-11-20 1922-11-03 Resignation Lucien Baillarge 1923-03-01 1932-09-01 Resignation J. Aldebert Lalonde 1932-11-02 1938-07-29 Resignation Joseph Rene Denis 1938-10-13 1955-04-02 Resignation Jean Jacques Denis * 1955-05-06 Acting Jean Jacques Denis * 1955-06-07 1967-06-14 Resignation Mlle Mariette Denis * 1967-09-11 Acting Mlle Mariette Denis 1971-05-22 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.