Collection search - Vancouver University Hill
-
Record information – Brief Vancouver University Hill
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:Vancouver Quadra, Vancouver SouthDate(s):Established Closing 1928-08-01 1956-01-16 Reopened Closing 1956-02-28 1957-01-07 1958-04-24 1959-02-27 Province:British ColumbiaReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:12026 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Location - 5732 University Blvd. - 1958-04-24Location - 5748 University Blvd. - 1950-12-04Location - 5760 University Blvd. - 1956-02-28, 1959-02-13Location - 5778 University Blvd. - 1955-05-24Location - Lot 7 Blk. 97 D.L. 140, Group 1, New Westminster DistrictStatus - Sub office - 1939-08-01StoreSource:PSFDS03-(24126)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Robert Joseph Elliott 1928-08-01 1931-04-28 Resignation Geo. Ambrose Powell 1875-06-01 1931-10-26 1932-01-25 Resignation Daniel J. Armstrong 1882-03-07 1932-04-18 1932-11-22 Resignation Wm. Edward Bell 1889-03-06 1933-03-06 1933-08-07 Resignation Wm. Thurlby OAS 1888-05-28 1934-09-12 1937-12-30 Resignation William Campbell Black 1885-09-09 1938-01-01 Acting William Campbell Black 1885-09-09 1938-01-26 1938-06 Resignation George Edward Fitzgerald OAS 1900-11-19 1938-07-01 Acting George Edward Fitzgerald OAS 1900-11-19 1938-11-05 1941-08-12 Resignation Frederick Allen Newman OAS 1899-06-17 1941-08-15 Acting Frederick Allen Newman OAS 1899-06-17 1941-09-27 1941-10-27 Resignation Lewis Jones 1892-03-19 1941-11-01 Acting Lewis Jones 1892-03-19 1941-12-22 1952-02-16 Resignation Roscoe Charles Alexander Heuser OAS * 1952-02-16 Acting Roscoe Charles Alexander Heuser OAS * 1952-04-29 1954-09-07 Resignation Thomas Tidball OAS 1900-09-26 1954-09-09 Acting Thomas Tidball OAS 1900-09-26 1954-11-17 1955-05-15 Resignation Basil Anthony Hedgecock OAS * 1955-05-24 Acting Basil Anthony Hedgecock OAS * 1955-10-05 1956-02-01 * Hugh Wallace MacEwen (re-opened) * 1956-02-28 Acting Hugh Wallace MacEwen * 1956-06-14 1957-01-07 Resignation Lionel Frederick Gurney * 1958-04-24 1959-02-02 Resignation Mrs. Cora MacEwen * 1959-02-13 Acting Temporarily closed - 1959-02-27 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.