Collection search - Milliken
-
Record information – Brief Milliken
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:York - ScarboroughEstablished:1859-04-01Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:10783 -
Record information – Details Additional information:PO 2671-1Semi Staff - 1967-02-01Source:PSFDS03-(6983)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Mathias Sanders 1859-04-01 1860-03 Death Andrew MacKay 1860-04-01 1860-11-20 Resignation William Gorvett 1861-06-01 1874-10 Death Mrs. M.A. Gorvett 1875-01-01 1881-01-31 Resignation W.H. Ferguson 1881-04-01 1886-01-28 Death Mrs. Susanna Milliken 1886-01-01 1887-11-23 Resignation Richard B. Popham 1888-01-01 1889-07-10 Resignation Thomas Hood 1889-08-01 1895-12-16 Resignation James Vanderburgh 1896-04-01 1898-12-11 Resignation George A. Prentice 1899-03-01 1930-10-15 Resignation Clifford Whittaker 1891-09-11 1931-02-17 1945-08-07 Resignation Frank Charlton O.A.S. 1896-07-21 1945-09-10 Acting Frank Charlton O.A.S. 1896-07-21 1946-03-08 1966-07-31 Replacement (C.S.C. 1961-06-01) William Joseph Ayres * 1967-05-15 1968-08-15 * Dorothy J. Rowe * 1969-02-14 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.