Collection search - Osnabruck Centre
-
Record information – Brief Osnabruck Centre
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:StormontDate(s):Established Closing 1853-11-01 1968-09-30 Province:OntarioReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:10222 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Osnabruck Centre Twp - 1853-10-01Source:PSFDS03-(3317)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy Jacob Poaps 1853-11-01 1877-06-30 Death Joshua F. Baker 1877-09-01 1883-10-30 Having left the place Gordon Baker 1883-12-20 1897-04-06 Resignation Orin Baker 1897-06-01 1905-04-12 Resignation J.F. Burton 1905-05-17 1911-11-01 Resignation Curtis O. Shaver 1911-11-21 1925-11-30 Resignation Mrs. Budd E. Hodgins 1925-12-31 1927-10-28 * Mrs. Budd E. Hallister (re-appt) 1927-11-24 1952-12-01 Resignation Aden Isaiah Swerdfeger 1888-12-28 1953-01-01 Acting Aden Isaiah Swerdfeger 1888-12-28 1953-01-09 1960-02-15 Death Mrs. Hilda Swerdfeger * 1960-06-23 Acting Mrs. Hilda Swerdfeger * 1960-10-14 1968-10-01 Closed *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.