Collection search - Georgeville
-
Record information – Brief Georgeville
Hierarchical level:ItemElectoral district:ComptonEstablished:Prior to 1832Province:QuebecReference:RG3-D-3Type of material:Textual materialFound in:Archives / Post Offices and PostmastersItem ID number:10095 -
Record information – Details Additional information:Adresse - rue MainBureau comptable - Grade 5Source:PSFDS03-(25752)Postmasters names and service information Name of postmaster Military status Date of birth Date of appointment Date of vacancy Cause of vacancy C. Bullock 1832 1839-01-05 Changement Joshua Copp 1839-01-06 1839-07-06 Resignation Taylor L. Parsons 1839-07-07 1843-01-06 Chauncey Bullock 1843-01-07 Willard A. Cole 1854 1856-01-03 Resignation Charles Stewart Channel 1856-07-01 1861-03-02 Resignation A. M. Bullock 1862-07-01 1863-10-10 Resignation Alex. Tinch 1863-10-01 1865-03-28 Resignation A. M. Bullock 1865-04-01 1868-05-18 Resignation Daniel Austin 1868-07-01 1869-12-30 Resignation Increase Bullock 1870-04-01 1886-12-24 Resignation H. I. Bullock 1887-01-01 1888-01-14 Resignation Chas. S. Copp 1888-04-01 1895 W. M. Keyes, M.D. 1895-08-01 1899-03-07 Changement de site D. A. Bullock 1901-01-07 1911-12-28 Changement de MP Dr. W. M. Keyes 1912-02-26 1914-06-28 Death Gordon C. McGowan 1914-07-28 1916-09-09 Resignation Jasnes E. Davidson 1916-10-03 1927-02-24 Resignation Ernest Foff Probya OAS 1927-07-08 1931-02-06 Resignation Clifford Adams Shorrys 1931-06-02 1932-07-02 Resignation Royal Charles Bachelder 1933-10-04 1940-08-09 Resignation Max Douglas Grainger * 1940-09-14 1973-06-04 Retired Mrs. G. Hornby * 1973-06-05 *In compliance with the Privacy Act (1983), certain personal information has been deleted from this file. -
Ordering and viewing options You can order materials in advance to be ready for you when you visit. You will need a user card to do this.
Cannot visit us on site? You can purchase a copy to be sent to you. Some restrictions may apply.